Page 15 - Nanyang Technological University
P. 15
ON A RAPID RISE
The other members of the senior management team are:
Prof Lam Khin Yong Prof Kam Chan Hin
Chief of Staff and Vice President (Research) Senior Associate Provost (Undergraduate Education)
Appointed on 1 July 2011 and 1 May 2014 respectively Appointed on 1 April 2014
• Chief of Staff-Designate • Associate Provost (Undergraduate Education)
(1 April – 30 June 2011) (1 July 2011 – 31 March 2014)
• Associate Provost (Graduate Education & Special • Associate Provost-Designate (Undergraduate
Projects) Education)
(1 April – 30 June 2011)
(1 April 2008 – 30 June 2011)
• Chair, School of Electrical & Electronic Engineering
• Chair, School of Mechanical & Aerospace Engineering (1 August 2006 – 31 March 2011)
(1 August 2006 – 30 April 2008)
Prof Er Meng Hwa Prof Angela Goh
Vice President (International Affairs) Associate Provost (Faculty Affairs)
Appointed on 1 July 2011 Appointed on 1 July 2011
• Vice President-Designate • Associate Provost-Designate (Faculty Affairs)
(International Affairs) (1 April – 30 June 2011)
(1 April – 30 June 2011)
• Acting Chair, School of Computer Engineering
• Senior Associate Provost (15 October 2007 – 31 January 2010)
(1 April 2008 – 30 June 2011)
• Associate Chair (Academic),
• Associate Provost School of Computer Engineering
(1 April 2007 – 31 March 2008)
(1 August 2006 – 30 November 2007)
Prof Lee Sing Kong Prof Yue Chee Yoon
Vice President (Education Strategies) Associate Provost (Graduate Education)
Appointed on 1 July 2014 Appointed on 2 January 2013
• Acting Dean, Interdisciplinary
• Director, National Institute of Education
(1 November 2006 – 30 June 2014) Graduate School
(1 September 2011 – 1 January 2013)
• Managing Director, National Institute of Education
International • Director, Institute for Sports Research
(from 1 July 2009) (15 July 2011 – 31 May 2012)
• Acting Director, National Institute of Education Assoc Prof Kwok Kian Woon
(16 January – 28 February 2006) Associate Provost (Student Life)
Appointed on 1 July 2011
• Dean, External Programmes (Knowledge Horizon), • Associate Provost-Designate (Student Life)
National Institute of Education
(1 October 2005 – 30 June 2009) (1 April – 30 June 2011)
• Associate Chair (Academic),
School of Humanities & Social Sciences
(1 August 2006 – 30 June 2011)
• Head, Division of Sociology,
School of Humanities & Social Sciences
(1 June 2004 – 30 June 2013)
13