Page 12 - Nanyang Technological University
P. 12
UNIVERSITY LEADERSHIP Mr Alwi Bin Abdul Hafiz
Sustainability Advisor
AS AT 31 JULY 2015 Golden Veroleum Liberia
Appointed on 28 March 2006
Board of Trustees
Mr Goh Sin Teck
Mr Koh Boon Hwee Editor
(Chairman) Lianhe Zaobao
Chairman Consulting Editor, MyPaper
Credence Partners Pte Ltd Appointed on 1 June 2012
Appointed on 28 March 2006
Mrs Lee Suet Fern
Ms Chan Lai Fung Managing Partner
Permanent Secretary Morgan Lewis Stamford LLC
(Education) Appointed on 15 July 2006
Ministry of Education
Appointed on 1 April 2012 Mr Lim Chee Onn
Senior International
Mr Kwek Leng Joo Adviser
Deputy Chairman Singbridge Pte Ltd
City Developments Ltd Appointed on 25 August 2009
Appointed on 28 March 2006
*Stepped down from the Board
*Stepped down from the Board on 12 August 2015
on 31 March 2015
Mr Lim Chuan Poh
Ms Lien Siaou-Sze Chairman
Senior Executive Coach Agency for Science,
Mobley Group Pacific Technology and Research
Appointed on 28 March 2006 Appointed on 28 March 2006
Mr Lim Chow Kiat
Group Chief Investment
Officer
GIC Pte Ltd
Appointed on 1 April 2015
10 NTU ANNUAL REPORT 2015